In simple words, we can say that vedic mathematics is just a unique method to make all of mathematical calculations faster. This helps in solving mathematical problems easily and in effective time. For example : Suppose you go to market to purchase something like books, clothes etc. The shopkeeper gives you some discount (say 33.5%). In this case, you find difficulty in calculating the percentage discount amount and whatever the shopkeeper ask, you pay it to him. But if you know vedic maths, then it will be easier to calculate them. It is also beneficial in exams for students. Today, time matters the most in competitive exams. Most person know the method to solve the question. But, there comes a matter of time who can solve faster. With vedic mathematics, you will be able to make calculations much faster without the need of calculator and the result will be solving problems in lesser time as compared to others. Here, some of its important parts are covered.

__Vedic Maths Tutorials__

**1. Multiplication**

Multiplication is the part of algebraic maths where users find most difficulty to calculate it. But, it becomes very easier if you do it from vedic mathematics. Lets do it with vedic maths. You will surely enjoy it.

i)

Lets do multiplication between two 1-digit numbers. Suppose we have to multiply 9x6.

Now 9 is 1 below to 10 and 6 is 4 below to 10. Write it like this,

9 1

X

6 4

---------------------

5 4 is the answer

Lets see how it came. For the left hand side digit(5), subtract the numbers diagonally from any side i.e 9 - 4 = 6 - 1 = 5. For the right hand sided digit, multiply the right hand sided numbers i.e 1x4 = 4. Now combine these, 54 will be the answer.

ii) __Multiplication of numbers near 100__

Now, lets do multiplication of two digit numbers close to 100. Suppose you have to multiply the numbers as 86x97. Again 86 is 14 below 100 and 97 is 3 below 100. Write it like this,

97 3

X

86 14

----------------------------

83 42 is the answer.

Lets see how it came. For getting the left hand side number(83), subtract the numbers diagonally i.e 97 - 14 = 86 - 3 = 83. For the left hand sided number(14), multiply the last right hand side numbers i.e 3x14 = 42. Combine these, 8342 will be the answer.

**iii) Multiply numbers just above 100.**

Now see for multiplication between 3-digit numbers just over 100. Suppose you have to multiply 106x104. Lets do it with trick of vedic maths.

106x104 = 11024.

Lets see how it happened easily. Actually the answer is in two parts 110 and 24. First part 110 comes from (106+4) or (104+6). Second part 24 comes from multiplication between unit's place dit numbers i.e 6x4 = 24. So, 11024 is the answer.

You have seen how it is easy to do the multiplication with vedic mathematics. No need to use calculator or pick copy pen for it. Now, you can do it in your mind itself. So, just do some more practices. More you will practice, more you will remember these tricks.

In this tutorial we will learn how to calculate square of a number very easily with vedic maths. Just in mind, you can do it.

Suppose we have a number as 75. We have to find out the square of this number. For this, we have to use copy pen for it and multiply 75x75. It will take too longer. But from now, you will be able to do it in your mind. No need to use copy pen.

Lets see :

75x75 = 5625 is the answer.

Now lets see how it came very easily. Actually the answer is in two parts(56 & 25). If you have to square any number ending with 5 then write 25 in last. Its the right part of the answer. For the left part(56), just increment the ten's place digit by 1 and multiply with it i.e 7x(7+1) = 7x8 = 56. Combine these results 5625 is the answer. Similarly,85x85 = 7225 and rest you can try yourself.

Herein this method, we will learn to calculate square of any two digit number. At the first time, it is possible that you feel it something typical. But after practicing it, you will find it too easier and also it will save your much time.

So, lets start : Suppose we have to square the number of 32.

Square of 32 = 32x32 = 1024. is the answer.

Lets see how the result came. Here start with the unit's place digit i.e 2. Square it. It will give you 4 (2x2). This is the unit's place digit of the answer. Now proceed, multiply the unit's place digit(2) and ten's place digit(3) and multiply the result by 2(here, 2 is not the unit's place digit... It is always fix to multiply by 2) i.e(3x2x2) and the result will give 12. Write its unit's place digit before 4(calculate above as 2x2) and keep in mind the carry of 12 i.e 1. Now, we get the last two digit of the answer i.e, 24. Again proceed for the complete answer, Now, square the ten's place digit i.e 3x3 = 9. And we had a carry of 1 earlier. So, add this to 9. It will give 10. Write 10 before 24. Combining all these, 1024 will be the answer.

Note:- More vedic mathematics tutorials will be provided here very soon...Hope, you enjoyed it...